Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing, in Anne Arundel County, a gift basket permit; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County to issue the permit to persons whose primary business is the sale of gift baskets; prohibiting the Board from issuing the permit for use on the premises of a chain store, supermarket, or discount house; limiting the total annual sales from alcoholic beverages to 10% of the annual gross sales of the permit holder; establishing a $100 fee for the gift basket permit; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0525
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {663496/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {663496/1 Adopted 47
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:45 PM