Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Voting by Felons at Polling Places - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Impallaria
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an applicant for voter registration to specify whether the applicant is a felon; requiring that specified information concerning voting by felons be provided to an applicant for voter registration; requiring an individual who is a felon to vote only by absentee ballot; prohibiting a felon from voting at a polling place; and limiting a provision of law allowing specified registered criminal offenders to enter onto school property for the purpose of voting only to registered offenders who are not felons.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0385 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-704, 11-722 )
(   3-202, 9-304.1, 9-312 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM