Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates Davis, Angel, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Branch, Brooks, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Glenn, Gutierrez, Holmes, C. Howard, Jalisi, Knotts, Kramer, Lafferty, McCray, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, S. Robinson, Sanchez, Smith, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the applicability of the prevailing wage rate law to political subdivisions, agencies, and public works on property where the State, a political subdivision, or an agency is the owner or lessee by altering the definition of "public body"; providing that the prevailing wage rate law applies to public work contracts greater than $25,000; requiring that prevailing wage rates be calculated using wage rates established by specified collective bargaining agreements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0711
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-201, 17-202, 17-208, 17-209, 17-214, 17-219, 17-220, 17-222, 17-224, 17-224.1, 17-226 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM