Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Handguns - School Employees - Handgun Permits and Carrying Weapons on School Property
Sponsored by
Delegate Impallaria
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county board to authorize school employees in the county board's school system to carry a handgun on school property under specified circumstances; requiring the Secretary of State Police to issue a handgun permit to a person who is otherwise qualified and who is a school employee in a school system in which the county board has authorized school employees to carry a handgun; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0436 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-102 )
(   3-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM