Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research Program
Sponsored by
Delegates V. Turner, Bromwell, Costa, Cullison, Donoghue, Elliott, Frank, Hubbard, Kach, A. Kelly, Kipke, McDonough, Morhaim, Murphy, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Ready, Reznik, and Tarrant
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Sickle Cell Disease Research Program to be administered by the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to provide grants for sickle cell disease research projects; establishing the purposes of the Program; establishing specified types of grants to be awarded under the Program; establishing the Sickle Cell Disease Research Fund; providing for the purposes and composition of the Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0384
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1026 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2013 2/04/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-463 through 10-468 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page