Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Build to Learn Act of 2019
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Solomon, Branch, Chang, Glenn, Hill, Jackson, Korman, Krimm, J. Lewis, Patterson, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before July 1, 2020, the Prince George's County government and the Prince George's County Board of Education to have a public-private partnership agreement in which the county government and the board of education contracts with a private entity for certain public school construction reviewed by the Maryland Stadium Authority and approved by the Interagency Committee on School Construction; establishing the Prince George's County Public-Private Partnership Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0731
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019, July 1, 2021, July 1, 2025
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664662/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Build to Learn Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-3)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Public School Construction - Maryland Stadium Authority - Supplemental Funds
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {664662/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 47
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Build to Learn Act of 2019
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-3) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 48
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-601, 10-618, 10-620, 10-628, 10-634, 10-649, 10-650, 10-658, 10-658.1 )
(   4-126.1, 4-126.2, 5-206, 5-303, 5-313, 5-317, 5-324 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:24 AM