Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Governmental Tort Claims - Excessive Force or Misuse of Force by Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, Conaway, Glenn, Haynes, Oaks, B. Robinson, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the liability of a local government for specified claims of excessive force or misuse of force by a law enforcement officer; increasing the liability of the State and its units for specified claims of excessive force or misuse of force by a law enforcement officer; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:26 AM