Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Disciplinary Actions - Written Policy
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Glenn, Oaks, and B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a law enforcement agency to adopt by January 1, 2016, a written policy and procedure to govern specified disciplinary actions that may be taken against a specified law enforcement officer; requiring each written policy to include specified information; requiring, under specified circumstances, a law enforcement officer to be disciplined in accordance with a specified policy and procedure; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1095 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-108, 3-111.1 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:26 AM