Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Extraordinary Medical Expenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 436
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "extraordinary medical expenses" to mean costs for medical treatment in excess of $250 in any calendar year under the child support guidelines; and applying the Act only to extraordinary medical expenses incurred on or after October 1, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0271 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Child Support - Extraordinary Medical Expenses
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Child Support - Extraordinary Medical Expenses
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62A
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 436
Text - Chapter - Child Support - Extraordinary Medical Expenses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-201, 12-204 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:33 AM