Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Morhaim, Barkley, Barve, Chang, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Jalisi, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Sample-Hughes, Sophocleus, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling or offering to sell alcoholic beverages that are sold in a powder or crystalline form for direct use or use in combination with water or any other substance; and providing a maximum fine of $1,000 for violation of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments {753899/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (118-21) 48
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {494030/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway) 61
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-326, 6-327, 6-328, 6-329 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM