Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - License and Registration - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsored by
Delegate Krebs
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing, from two to one, the number of sets of fingerprints an applicant for licensure or registration by the State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners is required to submit to the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository to obtain a criminal history records check; and requiring the Central Repository to provide to the Board a revised printed statement of the individual's criminal history record if criminal history record information is reported to the Central Repository after the initial criminal history records check.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1354 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - License and Registration - Criminal History Records Checks
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - License and Registration - Criminal History Records Checks
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 46
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/13/2020 4:39 PM