Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Dumais, and Vallario
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a person who is found guilty of murder in the first degree may be sentenced to life without the possibility of parole; establishing specified procedures for trial and sentencing in relation to the imposition of a sentence of life without the possibility of parole; applying the Act retroactively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-201, 2-202, 2-203, 2-301, 2-303, 2-304, 2-305, 2-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM