Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor, Conaway, Dumais, and Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a custodian of records to deny inspection of the part of a recording from a specified body-worn digital recording device worn by a law enforcement officer regarding specified individuals; requiring specified notification of specified individuals; requiring the Police Training and Standards Commission to develop specified uniform standards and policies in consultation with specified groups; requiring a custodian of records to allow inspection of a recording under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0970
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0947 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {882519/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-3)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {882519/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-3) 46A
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 45
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-356 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM