Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Administration of Diabetes Care Services - Guidelines
Sponsored by
Delegates D. Barnes, Angel, B. Barnes, Buckel, Fennell, Hornberger, Kelly, Long, Luedtke, Metzgar, Patterson, Platt, Reilly, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education and the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish specified guidelines for the administration of specified health care services to specified students with diabetes; requiring the State Department of Education and the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish a specified plan and make a report, on or before December 1, 2016, to specified committees of the General Assembly on implementation of the plan to provide diabetes care services to specified students; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0071
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0992 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {325569/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564832/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564832/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Committee Amendment {564832/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted (46-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {325569/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 58
Senate 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments {564832/1 Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments {564832/1 Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Second Reading Passed 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Committee Amendment {564832/1 Withdrawn 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted (46-0) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 68
House 4/12/2016 4/09/2016 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-426.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM