Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Collective Bargaining - Baltimore City Community College - Faculty
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Acevero, Bridges, Cullison, W. Fisher, Haynes, Ivey, Moon, Mosby, Proctor, Turner, Valderrama, Wells, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing collective bargaining rights to certain faculty at Baltimore City Community College; altering certain exceptions to the applicability of certain provisions of law governing collective bargaining for employees of Baltimore City Community College; and establishing a separate collective bargaining unit for all faculty at Baltimore City Community College.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Collective Bargaining - Baltimore City Community College - Faculty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Collective Bargaining - Baltimore City Community College - Faculty
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/9/2020 9:09 AM