Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Retail Pet Stores - Animal Seller, Dog Cage Signs, and Records - Requirement Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Kramer
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a retail pet store to ensure that a specified person from whom the retail pet store obtains a cat or dog has not received a specified citation on a specified report for a direct or critical violation within a specified period of time; requiring specified information to be posted on or near each dog's cage in a retail pet store; and requiring a specified written record about each dog in the possession of a retail pet store to include specified information.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {413192/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {987474/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Retail Pet Stores - Animal Seller, Dog Cage Signs, and Records - Requirement Revisions
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {413192/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Retail Pet Stores - Animal Seller, Dog Cage Signs, and Records - Requirement Revisions
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (117-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Finance 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {987474/1 Adopted 57
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Retail Pet Stores - Animal Seller, Dog Cage Signs, and Records - Requirement Revisions
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Text - Chapter - Retail Pet Stores - Animal Seller, Dog Cage Signs, and Records - Requirement Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-702.1, 19-703 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM