Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Equal Pay for Equal Work - Enforcement - Civil Penalties (Equal Pay Remedies and Enforcement Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen, Charkoudian, Dumais, Fennell, Glenn, Hettleman, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, Lopez, Luedtke, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Qi, Shetty, Stewart, Valderrama, C. Watson, Wilkins, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Commissioner of Labor and Industry or a court to require a certain employer to pay a civil penalty equal to 10% of the amount of damages owed by the employer for violating the Equal Pay for Equal Work Law two or more times within a 3-year period; and requiring that a civil penalty be paid to the General Fund of the State to offset the cost of enforcing the Act.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {393893/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-30)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Equal Pay for Equal Work - Enforcement - Civil Penalties (Equal Pay Remedies and Enforcement Act)
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {393893/1 Adopted 57
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Equal Pay for Equal Work - Enforcement - Civil Penalties (Equal Pay Remedies and Enforcement Act)
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (110-30) 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Referred Rules 59A
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694
Text - Chapter - Equal Pay for Equal Work - Enforcement - Civil Penalties (Equal Pay Remedies and Enforcement Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM