Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Credits - Electric Vehicles - Extensions
Sponsored by
Delegates McHale and Malone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the credit against the State income tax for qualified electric vehicle recharging equipment for specified tax years; providing for the amount of tax credit certificates that may be issued by the Maryland Energy Administration; altering the amount of credit that specified vehicles may claim; establishing that the credit is subject to available funding; transferring a specified amount of money from the Strategic Energy Investment Fund to the Transportation Trust Fund for fiscal year 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0728
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-6)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {109331/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-6)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (131-6) 47
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 46
Senate 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {109331/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (131-6) 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1002 )
(   9-20B-05 )
(   10-729 )
(   13-815 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM