Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation Claims
Sponsored by
Delegate Jameson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an insurer, a nonprofit health service plan, or a health maintenance organization to comply with specified prompt payment requirements, notwithstanding that compensability under the workers' compensation law remains to be determined for the injury or medical condition treated; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0680
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Reassigned to Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Reassigned to Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters 28
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
(   15-1005 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page