Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Reducing Environmental Degradation for the Underserved Through Community Engagement (The REDUCE Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Beidle, Carr, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Hill, Jalisi, Knotts, Lafferty, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, Morhaim, Platt, S. Robinson, Smith, Tarlau, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to require an applicant for a specified permit to construct or modify a specified source to report to the Department specified information regarding the diesel vehicles that are needed during the construction and operation of a source or proposed source and to solicit input on specified issues from the affected community and any community advisory board or similar organization in the affected area; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0398
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-404.1 )
(   23-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM