Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland - Regular Employees - Grievance Procedures and Disciplinary Actions
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, Acevero, Korman, Terrasa, Valentino-Smith, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a constituent institution of the University System of Maryland to remove, suspend, or demote a regular full-time or part-time employee who is not on probation only for cause, on written charges and in accordance with certain provisions of law; and clarifying that the University System of Maryland may not remove, suspend, or demote a regular full-time or part-time employee for any reason prohibited by State antidiscrimination law.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0711
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - University System of Maryland - Regular Employees - Grievance Procedures and Disciplinary Actions
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {214462/1 Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - University System of Maryland - Regular Employees - Grievance Procedures and Disciplinary Actions
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (95-42) 47
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {837572/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (104-33) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - University System of Maryland - Regular Employees - Grievance Procedures and Disciplinary Actions
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Text - Chapter - University System of Maryland - Regular Employees - Grievance Procedures and Disciplinary Actions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-111, 13-201, 13-205.1, 13-207 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:34 AM