Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program
Sponsored by
Delegate West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court exercising criminal jurisdiction in a certain case involving a child to suspend the sentence and place the child under the supervision of the Department of Juvenile Services for not longer than 18 months for enrollment in the Juvenile Diversion Program established by the Act; requiring the Program to provide an alternative to imprisonment for a child placed under the supervision of the Department; requiring the Program to provide certain services to each child enrolled; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0669
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-240.1, 9-247 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM