Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law on the collection of identifying information on certificates and licenses; requiring certain licensing authorities to make certain efforts to comply with certain data requirements and a certain implementation schedule of the Maryland Longitudinal Data System, and to transfer student data in accordance with the data security and safeguarding plan; requiring certain industry certifiers to comply with certain data requirements and a certain implementation schedule set forth by the Governing Board; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/10 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-22)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42
Text - Third - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/10 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 43A
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (111-22) 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/13/2020 4:40 PM