Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate - Applicability to Public School Construction Projects in Frederick County
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the prevailing wage rate that became effective on a specified date does not apply to procurement contracts executed on or after the effective date of the Act for specified public school construction projects in Frederick County; authorizing Frederick County and specified contractors voluntarily to renegotiate and agree to be bound by the prevailing wage rate in effect on a prior date with regard to specified previously executed public school construction procurement contracts; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1029
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page