Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Baltimore City Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to issue bonds to finance the construction of or improvements to specified Baltimore City public school facilities in accordance with a specified 10-year plan for Baltimore City Schools and subject to specified limitations; specifying that the Authority and the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners shall be responsible for specified public school facilities construction and improvement projects; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0743
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013, July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {124761/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {804863/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Jones) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted (123-11)
Proceedings
50A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {483626/1 Rejected (41-92)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {493629/1 Rejected (42-88)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {483424/1 Rejected (41-93)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Motion Laid Over (Delegate Szeliga)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Motion to not allow Laid Over (Delegate Haynes) Adopted (94-43)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-30)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {169739/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (40-7)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-30)
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {124761/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {804863/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Special Order until next session (Delegate Jones) Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted (123-11) 50A
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {483626/1 Rejected (41-92) 51
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {493629/1 Rejected (42-88) 51
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {483424/1 Rejected (41-93) 51
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Motion Laid Over (Delegate Szeliga) 52
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Motion to not allow Laid Over (Delegate Haynes) Adopted (94-43) 52
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (107-30) 52
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 52
Senate 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments {169739/1 Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/26/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (40-7) 57
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 60A
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (102-30) 60A
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Passed Enrolled 60A
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
3/29/2013 Amendments Senate - (Budget and Taxation) {169739/01 Adopted
3/20/2013 Amendments House - (Appropriations) {124761/01 Adopted
3/21/2013 Amendments House - (Delegate O'Donnell) {483424/01 Rejected
3/21/2013 Amendments House - (Delegate Krebs) {483626/01 Rejected
3/21/2013 Amendments House - (Delegate McDonough) {493629/01 Rejected
3/20/2013 Amendments House - (Appropriations) {804863/01 Adopted
3/21/2013 Analysis - Bill as Amended in House
2/07/2013 Text - First - Baltimore City Public Schools Construction Authority
3/21/2013 Text - Third - Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
4/03/2013 Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
5/23/2013 Text - Chapter - Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
3/20/2013 Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
3/29/2013 Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
3/17/2013 Vote - House Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/21 (Krebs) Adopted (123-11) - 03/17/13
3/18/2013 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Krebs) {483626/1 Rejected (41-92) - 03/18/13
3/18/2013 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McDonough) {493629/1 Rejected (42-88) - 03/18/13
3/18/2013 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {483424/1 Rejected (41-93) - 03/18/13
3/19/2013 Vote - House Floor - Motion to not allow Laid Over (Haynes) Adopted (94-43) - 03/19/13
3/19/2013 Vote - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-30) - 03/19/13
3/27/2013 Vote - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-30) - 03/27/13
3/26/2013 Vote - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) - 03/26/13
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-601, 10-620, 10-628, 10-629 through 10-633, 10-634, 10-635, 10-636, 10-639, 10-645, 10-646, 10-656, 10-657 )
(   4-115, 4-306.1, 4-306.2, 5-202, 5-301 )
(   9-120, 9-120.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM