Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Individuals Working in STEM Fields - Student Loan Payments
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Barkley, Ciliberti, Gutierrez, R. Lewis, Stein, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a credit against the State income tax for the amount certain individuals pay toward certain student loans during the taxable year; providing for the carryforward of the credit; authorizing certain individuals, on or before December 1 each year, to apply to the Department of Commerce for the credit; requiring the application to contain certain information; requiring the Department and the Maryland Higher Education Commission jointly to review the applications and award the tax credits; applying the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Individuals Working in STEM Fields - Student Loan Payments
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-746 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM