Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and Taxation
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey, Frush, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified definitions and defining specified terms for the purpose of applying specified provisions of law regulating the sale, manufacture, distribution, possession, and use of cigarettes and tobacco products and paraphernalia to electronic smoking devices; altering the definition of "cigarette" for the purpose of applying the provisions of law related to the tobacco tax to the sale of electronic smoking devices; repealing an obsolete provision of law; and making conforming changes.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-501, 11-5A-01 )
(   10-101, 10-107, 10-108 )
(   24-205, 24-212, 24-305, 24-501, 24-502, 24-503, 24-507, 24-510 )
(   12-101, 12-103, 12-104, 12-105, 12-201, 12-202, 12-302, 12-304, 13-1012, 13-1014, 13-1015, 13-1104, 13-408, 13-508, 13-509, 13-701, 13-711, 13-825, 13-826, 13-834, 13-901, 2-1601, 2-1602, 2-1603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM