Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
Sponsored by
Delegates D. Barnes, Ebersole, Fennell, Hornberger, Knotts, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Simonaire, Tarlau, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing requirements for naming of the defendants in an action to foreclose the right of redemption on property sold at a tax sale; and establishing requirements for filing a specified affidavit in an action to foreclose the right of redemption on property sold at a tax sale.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Referred Rules 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/06/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Text - Chapter - Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
(   14-836 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page