Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Frush, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Brooks, Carr, Clippinger, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gaines, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hammen, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, Jalisi, Kelly, Korman, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, S. Robinson, Sanchez, Smith, Stein, Tarlau, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program; requiring the Maryland Environmental Service to develop, implement, and administer the Program; requiring that every redeemable beverage container sold in the State indicate a 5-cent refund value in a specified manner on and after July 1, 2017; requiring that a specified refund value be added to the retail price of a specified container at the time of purchase on and after a specified date; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0367
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1733 through 9-1742 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM