Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsored by
Delegates Arora, Barkley, Clippinger, Conaway, Dumais, Elliott, Frick, Glass, Hershey, Hixson, Hough, Ivey, Lee, McComas, McDermott, McDonough, A. Miller, Mitchell, Murphy, Myers, Niemann, Parrott, Reznik, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Stukes, Szeliga, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a State's Attorney to file a petition to freeze assets of a defendant charged with a specified financial crime involving a vulnerable or elder adult under specified circumstances; requiring that a petition to freeze assets be served in accordance with the Maryland Rules and include specified information; authorizing a court to grant a petition to freeze assets and issue an order to freeze assets under specified circumstances; requiring that an order to freeze assets remain in effect for a specified period of time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM