Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State and Public School Holidays - Designation and Observance
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Fisher, Acevero, Atterbeary, Barron, Charkoudian, Charles, Crutchfield, Fraser-Hidalgo, Henson, Hill, Ivey, Johnson, Kelly, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lopez, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Wells, Wilkins, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Synopsis
Designating the day after Thanksgiving as American Indian Heritage Day and a public school holiday; requiring public schools to devote part of at least one day to appropriate exercises for American Indian Heritage Day; designating September 17 for Constitution Day and Citizenship Day as a public school holiday; repealing Columbus Day as a legal State holiday; designating September 17 for Constitution Day and Citizenship Day as a legal State holiday; and designating statewide primary election days as legal State holidays.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State and Public School Holidays - Designation and Observance
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Text - First - State and Public School Holidays - Designation and Observance
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-103 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:09 PM