Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Confidentiality of Police and Court Records Pertaining to Minor
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, Clippinger, Dumais, Glass, K. Kelly, McDermott, Rosenberg, Simmons, Swain, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified police and court records pertaining to a minor are confidential and their contents may not be divulged except under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-501, 4-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM