Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsored by
Delegates Pippy, Cain, Atterbeary, Cardin, Chang, Cox, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, W. Fisher, J. Lewis, Lopez, Moon, Mosby, Shetty, Sydnor, R. Watson, Wilkins, Grammer, Bartlett, McComas, Hartman, Arikan, and Malone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the elements of the prohibitions against human trafficking and renaming them sex trafficking; prohibiting a person from knowingly taking another for prostitution by use of or intent to use force, threat, coercion, or fraud; prohibiting a person from knowingly engaging in certain conduct with the intent to compel another to marry any person under certain circumstances; classifying a certain offense of human trafficking as a crime of violence under certain provisions of law; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0690
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1276 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {432917/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {108075/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {432917/1 Adopted 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {108075/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Beidle) Adopted 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
(   10-402, 10-406, 3-8A-19, 4-301 )
(   11-301, 11-303, 11-305, 11-306, 11-307, 14-101, 3-1101, 3-1102, 3-1103, 3-324, 9-801 )
(   10-110, 10-301, 11-701, 13-501, 13-502, 13-503, 13-507, 13-508, 13-514, 13-518, 13-522, 13-524, 13-525, 13-528, 8-302 )
(   2-412, 5-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page