Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Civil Penalty, Fund, and Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais and Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Attorney General to institute a civil action against specified professionals who fail to report child abuse or neglect under specified circumstances; establishing a civil penalty for each violation; requiring a civil penalty collected under the Act to be deposited in the Child Abuse Prevention Fund; establishing that the civil penalty established under the Act is in addition to any other penalty provided by law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-704, 5-704.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM