Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy - Electric and Gas Bills (100% Clean Renewable Energy Equity Act of 2018)
Sponsored by
Delegates Robinson, Fraser-Hidalgo, Morales, Platt, Ali, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barron, Carr, Conaway, Cullison, Ebersole, Frush, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hettleman, Holmes, Jalisi, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morhaim, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Reznik, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making permanent the Community Solar Energy Generating System Program; altering the definition of "qualified energy resources" as it relates to the clean energy production income tax credit; establishing the Maryland Megawatt Block Program in the Public Service Commission; establishing the Office of Offshore Wind Procurement in the Department of Natural Resources; repealing various provisions of law regarding the renewable energy portfolio standard; establishing a new renewable energy portfolio standard; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018, January 1, 2019, January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Utilities - Renewable Energy - Electric and Gas Bills (100% Clean Renewable Energy Equity Act of 2018)
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1101 through 3-1110 )
(   7-305.1, 7-306.2, 7-311, 7-701, 7-702, 7-703, 7-704, 7-705, 7-706, 7-708, 7-709, 7-710, 7-711, 7-712, 7-713, 7-714 )
(   9-20B-05, 9-20C-03 )
(   10-720 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM