Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger Activator
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, J. Lewis, Walker, Ali, Anderson, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Branch, Brooks, Busch, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gibson, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Jackson, Jalisi, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, Wilson, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from transporting a certain rapid fire trigger activator into the State or manufacturing, possessing, selling, offering to sell, transferring, purchasing, or receiving a certain rapid fire trigger activator, subject to a certain exception; defining "rapid fire trigger activator" as any device, including a removable manual or power-driven activating device, constructed so that, when installed in or attached to a firearm the rate at which the trigger is activated increases or the rate of fire increases; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0707
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger Activator
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {642411/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Afzali) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {553221/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected (50-87)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {243325/1 (Delegate S. Howard) Rejected (37-96)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {553823/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (44-91)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger Activator
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-7)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {243826/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (18-28)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {603625/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-29)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {703223/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-30)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {323627/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-28)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {963123/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (16-30)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-11)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger Activator
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {642411/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Afzali) Adopted 44
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Floor Amendment {553221/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected (50-87) 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Floor Amendment {243325/1 (Delegate S. Howard) Rejected (37-96) 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Floor Amendment {553823/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (44-91) 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger Activator
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (128-7) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Floor Amendment {243826/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (18-28) 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Floor Amendment {603625/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-29) 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Floor Amendment {703223/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-30) 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Floor Amendment {323627/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-28) 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Floor Amendment {963123/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (16-30) 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (35-11) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-301, 4-305.1, 4-306 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:32 AM