Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
State and Local Police Officers - Liability Insurance - Required
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, and B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Police Training Commission from certifying an individual as a police officer unless the individual provides proof of professional liability insurance in a specified amount; requiring police officers to maintain professional liability insurance coverage during a specified period of employment; providing that specified professional liability insurance is primary coverage under specified circumstances and shall include coverage for specified acts or omissions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:26 AM