Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Land Use - Department of Planning - Permit for Development Projects
Sponsored by
Delegates Aumann and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person that undertakes a development project that involves the construction of a total of 50 or more surface parking spaces, will result in a total of 50 or more surface parking spaces when combined with existing surface parking spaces, and is located within one-half mile of a scenic byway to apply to the Department of Planning for a permit; requiring the Department to provide an opportunity for public comment on the permit application; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0366
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-103, 1-401, 1-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM