Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Transportation Access
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Bridges, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gaines, Ghrist, Harrison, Healey, Hettleman, Krimm, and Lierman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 705
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Transportation Access for the purpose of reviewing certain information, findings, and recommendations to improve transportation access; requiring the Task Force to make a final report of its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0642
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Transportation Access
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {760415/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Transportation Access
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-39)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {887371/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-32)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Task Force to Study Transportation Access
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 705
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Task Force to Study Transportation Access
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Task Force to Study Transportation Access
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {760415/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Transportation Access
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (100-39) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Finance 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments {887371/1 Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (104-32) 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Task Force to Study Transportation Access
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 705
Text - Chapter - Task Force to Study Transportation Access
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:24 AM