Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Sponsored by
Delegates Szeliga, Brooks, and Cardin
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a gift basket permit in Baltimore County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore County to issue the permit to certain persons; providing that the permit authorizes a permit holder to sell and deliver gift baskets containing wine to consumers of a legal drinking age in the State; requiring a permit holder to maintain certain records and submit certain reports; limiting the value of the wine contained in a gift basket to 75% of the total value of the gift basket; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1001.1, 13-102 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:12 PM