Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Electric Generating Systems - Net Metering and Community Solar Energy
Sponsored by
Delegates Barkley, Robinson, Carr, Kaiser, Korman, Kramer, McCray, Moon, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the generating capacity limit for an electric generating system used by an eligible customer-generator for net metering and a community solar energy generating system under certain circumstances; requiring an electric generating system used by an eligible customer-generator for net metering and a community solar energy generating system to comply with local land use and planning laws; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0557
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Utilities - Electric Generating Systems - Net Metering and Community Solar Energy
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   7-306, 7-306.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page