Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer and Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative in the Department of the Environment for certain purposes; requiring the Secretary of the Environment to administer certain schedules of greenhouse gas pollution charges; requiring the Secretary to delegate certain collection and rebate functions to the Comptroller; requiring the Comptroller to carry out certain functions; requiring the collection of a certain greenhouse gas pollution charge on certain fuels and certain greenhouse gas-emitting priorities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1201, 2-1202, 2-1214 through 2-1223 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM