Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, James, and Lee
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program and Fund; specifying the purposes of the Program and the Fund; requiring the Maryland Biotechnology Center in the Department of Business and Economic Development to administer the Fund; establishing specified criteria and award amounts for grants awarded under the Program; requiring recipients of Program funds to pay a specified royalty; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0708
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1401 through 5-1406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM