Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Charitable, Educational, or Religious Properties - Tax on Formerly Exempt Property
Sponsored by
Delegate Hogan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, except under specified circumstances, for provisions of law concerning specified charitable, educational, or religious property, when any property that was formerly exempt from property tax is sold and the property is no longer entitled to the exemption, the property tax is payable for the remainder of the taxable year from the date of transfer; making the Act applicable to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {115963/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {115963/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 48
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-104, 7-202, 7-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM