Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates McHale, Barkley, Barnes, Braveboy, Burns, Carr, Clagett, Frick, Glenn, Hucker, A. Kelly, K. Kelly, Love, Luedtke, Mizeur, Niemann, Olszewski, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, V. Turner, Vaughn, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to convene a specified workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding public works contractor occupational safety and health prequalification requirements; requiring that the workgroup include representatives of specified organizations including the American Society of Safety Engineers and the Alliance for Construction Excellence; providing for the termination of the Act at the end of June 30, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0774
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1486 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703292/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {557979/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments {703292/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 54
Senate 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/01/2014 4/01/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {557979/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 63
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:39 PM