Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Prevailing Wage Enforcement Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Mizeur, Barkley, Bobo, Braveboy, Frick, Glenn, Howard, Kaiser, V. Turner, Waldstreicher, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Division of Labor and Industry in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to collect and retain a specified civil penalty rather than have the penalty paid into the General Fund; requiring a contractor to pay specified liquidated damages for late submission of payroll records to the Division and not to the General Fund; requiring a contractor to pay specified liquidated damages for failing to pay a specified laborer or employee the prevailing wage to the Division and not to the General Fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1283 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM