Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Hepatitis C Drugs
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Hill, Johnson, and Queen
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to the limitations of the State budget, to provide coverage for any medically appropriate drugs that are approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration for the treatment of hepatitis C, regardless of the fibrosis score, and that are determined to be medically necessary.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0598
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Hepatitis C Drugs
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {396081/1 Adopted 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Hepatitis C Drugs
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:34 AM