Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Raffles - Charitable Foundation Affiliated With Professional Football Team PG 303-14
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a 50/50 raffle to be conducted in Prince George's County by a specified charitable foundation affiliated with a professional football team that plays its home games in the county; setting no limitation on the number of raffle permits that may be issued in a year; authorizing the charitable foundation to set the price of raffle tickets and to award prizes in any amount in money or in merchandise, but prohibiting the amount from exceeding 50% of the raffle proceeds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1902, 13-1908, 13-1909, 13-1910, 13-1911, 13-1911.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM