Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
The Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentive Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates Walker, Hornberger, and Metzgar
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland International thoroughbred race; providing that the Maryland International is a Grade 1 stakes race run on a turf track; providing for the funding of the purse for the Maryland International beginning on July 1, 2017; providing that money from the State Lottery Fund be distributed as part of a bonus award program for Maryland-bred or-sired horses running in the Preakness Stakes in fiscal year 2017; providing that specified funds from the State Lottery Fund be distributed to pay for specified sporting events; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {295668/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {657877/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {273228/2 Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments {295668/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 48
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Finance 47A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {657877/1 Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {273228/2 Adopted 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-402, 11-403, 11-522.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM