Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Ineligible Tier 1 Sources
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, R. Lewis, Smith, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility of certain sources of energy in Baltimore City for the creation of credits under the renewable energy portfolio standard; providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act; and applying the Act to all renewable energy portfolio standard compliance years beginning after December 31, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Baltimore City - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Ineligible Tier 1 Sources
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   7-701, 7-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page